MD SB363 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "beneficial ownership" to mean any ownership interest of 25% rather than 5% for the purposes of certain disclosures made by certain businesses to the Secretary of State under certain circumstances.
Title
Procurement Contracts - Disclosures to Secretary of State - Beneficial Ownership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB1127 (Carry Over) 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1471 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-14 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1471 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-14 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0363?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0363f.pdf |