MD SB367 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income from the discharge of indebtedness related to acquiring, constructing, substantially improving, or refinancing a principal residence; providing that the subtraction does not apply to more than $100,000 for an individual and $200,000 for a married couple filing jointly or specified individuals; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |