MD SB37 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Finding that local governments pay electric companies large sums to light streets and are limited in how this public safety resource can be managed, the Act authorizes certain counties or municipalities to acquire certain street lighting equipment by purchase or condemnation, convert its street lighting service to a customer-owned street lighting tariff, enter into an agreement to purchase electricity, and contract with an electric company for the maintenance of the street lighting equipment; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Street Lighting Equipment - Acquisitions and Reporting (County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB409 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Appraisals
Codes
Condemnation
Contracts
Counties
Electricians
Energy Matters
Engineers
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prices
Public Employees
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
Street Lights
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Codes
Condemnation
Contracts
Counties
Electricians
Energy Matters
Engineers
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prices
Public Employees
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
Street Lights
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 4 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |