MD SB378 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a barbershop and beauty salon beer and wine license in Harford County; authorizing the Harford County Liquor Control Board to issue the license to the holder of certain business permits; authorizing the holder of the license to serve certain amounts of beer and wine for on-premises consumption to an individual in a single day under certain circumstances; prohibiting the license from being transferred to another location; providing an annual license fee of $400; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {953127/2 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {104136/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {104136/1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Barbers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Harford County
Job Training
Licenses
Records
Special Events
Time
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Barbers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Harford County
Job Training
Licenses
Records
Special Events
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |