MD SB391 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a certain individual who is a civilian employee of the federal government is eligible to receive unemployment benefits under certain circumstances; altering the purpose of the Catastrophic Event Account to enable the State to respond to federal civilian employee financial hardship from a full or partial federal government shutdown due to a lapse in federal appropriations; establishing a certain loan fund to provide loans to civilian employees of the federal government under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-27) (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-27) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {387875/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Federal Government
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Loans
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor and Employment
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Loans
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor and Employment