MD SB400 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the month of June as Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and to urge the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Department of Aging, in conjunction with specified entities, to properly observe Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities, including specified summits and updates.
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Diseases
Elderly Persons
Governor
Health
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Elderly Persons
Governor
Health
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials