MD SB449 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified holders of off-sale alcoholic beverages licenses in Frederick County to start selling alcoholic beverages at 11 a.m. instead of 12 noon or 1 p.m. on Sundays; and allowing sales to continue until 2 a.m. on each day of the week.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sales Hours
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |