MD SB449 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB911
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the limitations on the amount of compensatory damages and punitive damages that may be awarded to a complainant in a certain unlawful employment practice case; and increasing the period of time, from 2 years to 3 years, for which a claimant may recover back pay in a certain unlawful employment practice case.
Title
Unlawful Employment Practices - Remedies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-4) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {273628/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB911 (Carry Over) 2021-04-12 - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |