MD SB453 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering to 50 yards from a dwelling house, residence, church, or any other building or camp occupied by human beings the size of the safety zone for archery hunters in Allegany County and Garrett County within which archery hunting may not take place except under certain circumstances.
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-9) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB637 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Subjects
Allegany County
Camps
Garrett County
Housing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Places of Worship
Residential Property
Safety
Weights and Measures
Camps
Garrett County
Housing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Places of Worship
Residential Property
Safety
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |