MD SB457 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a contractor or subcontractor that performs work on a construction project that receives funding from the State capital budget in the amount of $100,000 or more to be affiliated with, and to use apprentices from, an apprenticeship program that is registered with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation or the United States Department of Labor, or requiring the contractor or subcontractor to make specified payments to the State Apprenticeship Training Fund or to specified apprenticeship programs; etc.
Title
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Apprentices
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment