MD SB47 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the State procurement law to grant a preference for American manufactured goods in State contracting; requiring a public body to require that specified contractors and subcontractors use or supply American manufactured goods under specified procurements; requiring a public body to give a specified notice; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations regarding the granting of a preference for the use of American manufactured goods; etc.
Title
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured Goods
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-2) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {986485/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {114330/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {114330/1 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2012-08-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Construction
Contractors
Counties
Education, Boards of
Emergencies
Equipment
International Affairs
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Public Works
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Procurement
Construction
Contractors
Counties
Education, Boards of
Emergencies
Equipment
International Affairs
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Public Works
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Procurement