MD SB47 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing an obsolete provision of law relating to certification of creditable coverage; requiring a certain carrier to provide an open enrollment period for individuals who lose access to health care services through a certain program, which is considered to occur on the last day the eligible employee or dependent would have access to services; requiring a certain carrier to provide an open enrollment period for certain individuals who lived in a service area where a qualified health plan was not available during a certain time; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-16) (Y: 122 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-16) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-3) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {707479/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Federal Government
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Minors
Pregnancy
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Minors
Pregnancy
Work, Labor and Employment