MD SB471 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from establishing an off-road vehicle trail on State-owned property located in Sideling Hill in Washington County, including the Sideling Hill Wildlife Management Area and specified other areas; requiring the Department to review and evaluate, regarding its suitability for preservation, the Sideling Hill Wildlife Management Area and State-owned property in the areas of Sideling Hill; etc.
Title
Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {883823/1 Adopted |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Edwards) Adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Favorable |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Animals
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Noise
Off-Road Vehicles
Washington County
Wildlands
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Noise
Off-Road Vehicles
Washington County
Wildlands