MD SB475 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB140
Note: Carry Over of previous SB500
Note: Carry Over of previous SB500
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on each Sunday of the deer hunting seasons from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January, inclusive, in Talbot County; authorizing the Department to allow a person who is 16 years old or younger to hunt turkey on one Sunday of the spring turkey hunting season in Talbot County if participating in a certain junior hunt; and authorizing a person to hunt deer and turkey on certain public land in Talbot County under certain circumstances.
Title
Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB475 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB325 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB500 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
HB325 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB500 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0475?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0475f.pdf |