MD SB479 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the distribution of revenue from civil fines collected through the use of work zone speed control systems to include certain distributions for highway and work zone safety purposes; clarifying that a work zone speed control system may be manned or unmanned and a system operator does not need to be present when a work zone speed control system is in use; altering the maximum penalty for a civil citation issued as a result of a recorded image produced by a work zone speed control system; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Revisions (Maryland Road Worker Protection Act of 2024)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-10) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment {263625/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {953628/1 Adopted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB513 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Subjects
Boundaries
Citations
Data
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pilot Programs
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
studies
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Citations
Data
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pilot Programs
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
studies
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Transportation | 12 | 118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |