MD SB493 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Libraries
Reports
Sunset
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Libraries
Reports
Sunset