MD SB494 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a health care facility from providing peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis treatment services unless the individual performing the dialysis procedure has been trained in the peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis technique being performed; establishing civil penalties not exceeding $5,000 for each violation of the Act; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {697073/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB494 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Diseases
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |