MD SB50 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the State income tax for education awards from the Segal AmeriCorps Education Award program; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Segal AmeriCorps Education Award
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2012-08-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |