MD SB50 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using specified identifying information or the identity of an individual without consent to invite, encourage, or solicit another to commit a sexual crime against the individual; establishing penalties; authorizing a State's Attorney or the Attorney General to investigate and prosecute a violation of the Act; providing that when the Attorney General exercises the authority to investigate and prosecute a violation of the Act, the Attorney General has specified powers and duties; etc.
Title
Crimes - Use of Personal Identifying Information or the Identity of Another - Sexual Crimes
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Attorney General
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fraud
Grand Juries
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Penalties and Sentences
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fraud
Grand Juries
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Penalties and Sentences
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys