MD SB50 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to extend a certain review period for up to an additional 30 days for a certain filing made by a health maintenance organization if the Commissioner gives the health maintenance organization certain notice; authorizing the Commissioner to extend for an additional 30 days the period during which a certain amendment may not take effect if the Commissioner gives a certain corporation certain notice; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Form Filings - Review and Waiting Period Extensions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Communications
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Notices
Reports
Time
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Notices
Reports
Time