MD SB50 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund to send a written notice of intention to certain policyholders at least 10 days before the Fund proposes to cancel a certain policy for nonpayment of a premium owed under a certain installment payment plan.
Title
Insurance - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Cancellation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m. |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |