MD SB50 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB79
Note: Carry Over of previous SB359
Note: Carry Over of previous SB359
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-17 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-17 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State and certain units and instrumentalities of the State from using any appropriation for a magnetic levitation transportation system in the State; and providing that the prohibition does not apply to certain expenditures for salaries.
Title
State Finance – Prohibited Appropriations – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2022-11-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB50 (Carry Over) 2023-01-17 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
HB106 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
SB359 (Carry Over) 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
HB106 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
SB359 (Carry Over) 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Subjects
Appropriations
Mass Transit
Procurement
Railroads
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Mass Transit
Procurement
Railroads
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0050?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0050f.pdf |