MD SB502 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 976
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 976
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Allegany County or a municipal corporation in Allegany County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property that is owned by the Evergreen Heritage Center.
Title
Allegany County – Property Tax Credit – Evergreen Heritage Center
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 976 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB636 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 975
Subjects
Allegany County
Historical Matters
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Historical Matters
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |