MD SB506 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting specified errors or omissions in specified articles of the Annotated Code and in specified uncodified laws; clarifying language; correcting specified obsolete references; reorganizing specified sections of the Annotated Code; ratifying specified corrections made by the publishers of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; etc.
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-02-29 | House | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Senate Rules |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |