MD SB506 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Granting the Town of Forest Heights in Prince George's County the authority to exercise urban renewal powers in areas zoned for commercial use for blight clearance and redevelopment under Article III, Section 61 of the Maryland Constitution; and authorizing the municipality to levy certain taxes and issue general obligation bonds and revenue bonds to carry out urban renewal powers.
Title
Town of Forest Heights (Prince George's County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | House Recede |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-15) |
2023-04-10 | House | Motion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2023-04-10 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-7) |
2023-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {633021/1 Adopted |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB825 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bonds
Building Maintenance and Repair
Charters
Commerce and Business
Commercial Property
Condemnation
Construction
Contracts
Federal Aid
Grants
Hearings
Insurance
Laws and Ordinances
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
News Media
Notices
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Urban Renewal
Zoning and Planning
Bonds
Building Maintenance and Repair
Charters
Commerce and Business
Commercial Property
Condemnation
Construction
Contracts
Federal Aid
Grants
Hearings
Insurance
Laws and Ordinances
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
News Media
Notices
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Urban Renewal
Zoning and Planning