MD SB507 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Transportation and the Secretary of General Services to review certain State contracts and report findings regarding contract modifications related to the price of materials to the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Title
Procurement - Construction Contracts - Contract Modification - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {803928/1 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |