MD SB512 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB87
Note: Carry Over of previous SB809
Note: Carry Over of previous SB809
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Correctional Ombudsman in the Office of the Attorney General; requiring the Ombudsman to conduct investigations, reviews, and assessments of administrative acts taken by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services or in relation to individuals confined by the Department; requiring the Ombudsman to refer matters for criminal charges or disciplinary proceedings when appropriate; establishing the Correctional Ombudsman Advisory Board; etc.
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB512 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
SB809 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
HB604 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
SB809 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
HB604 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Discipline
Education
Electronic Government
Ethics
Health
Inspections
Job Training
Mediation
Mental and Behavioral Health
Ombudsmen
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Subpoenas
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Discipline
Education
Electronic Government
Ethics
Health
Inspections
Job Training
Mediation
Mental and Behavioral Health
Ombudsmen
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Subpoenas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 8 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 8 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0512?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0512f.pdf |