MD SB522 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-05 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-05 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Video Lottery Facility Commission to conduct a study to assess the financial impact of offering specified games in video lottery facilities; and requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2011.
Title
Video Lottery Facility Commission - Financial Impact of Additional Games -
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0522.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0522f.pdf |