MD SB522 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing specified eligible employers a credit against the State income tax for employing specified interns, which may not exceed $1,000 for each eligible intern or 10% of the wages paid to each eligible intern, subject to specified limitations; requiring an eligible employer to enter into a specified agreement with an eligible higher education institution; providing that no more than $300,000 in tax credit certificates may be issued in any taxable year; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible Internships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {489839/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Comptroller
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Income Tax
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Students
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Income Tax
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Students
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment