MD SB522 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB933
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership and qualifications of members of the Accountability and Implementation Board; and requiring the Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee to submit a certain slate of nominees to the Governor on or before August 1, 2023.
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB933 (Carry Over) 2022-02-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
HB740 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
HB740 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Allegany County
Calvert County
Caroline County
Carroll County
Cecil County
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dorchester County
Eastern Shore
Education
Frederick County
Garrett County
Governor
Kent County
Primary and Secondary Education
Queen Anne's County
Somerset County
St. Mary's County
Students
Talbot County
Washington County
Weights and Measures
Western Maryland
Wicomico County
Worcester County
Calvert County
Caroline County
Carroll County
Cecil County
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dorchester County
Eastern Shore
Education
Frederick County
Garrett County
Governor
Kent County
Primary and Secondary Education
Queen Anne's County
Somerset County
St. Mary's County
Students
Talbot County
Washington County
Weights and Measures
Western Maryland
Wicomico County
Worcester County
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0522?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0522f.pdf |