MD SB53 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund may not discriminate among insureds by charging different premiums to insureds who select, as a payment option, the Fund's installment payment plan instead of a premium finance agreement; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plan - Clarification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-01-16 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {807176/1 Report Adopted |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Discrimination
Emergency Bills
Insurance - Other than Health
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Prices
Emergency Bills
Insurance - Other than Health
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Prices