MD SB536 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Radiation Emergency Response Program in the Department of the Environment; requiring the Department to serve as an offsite response organization and the lead State agency for all nuclear incidents within the State; requiring the Department to prepare a technical emergency radiation response plan, respond to emergencies involving a nuclear power plant, participate in a certain federal program, and procure certain specialized equipment; etc.
Title
Environment - Nuclear Power Plants - Emergency Preparedness (Radiation and Emergency Preparedness and Protection Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-6) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB680 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Subjects
Appropriations
Boundaries
Budgets
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Emergencies
Emergency Management, Department of
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Federal Government
Fees
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Interest
Investments
Nuclear Matters
Power Plants
Procurement
Public Safety
Radiation
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Storage
Boundaries
Budgets
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Emergencies
Emergency Management, Department of
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Federal Government
Fees
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Interest
Investments
Nuclear Matters
Power Plants
Procurement
Public Safety
Radiation
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Storage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 8 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 8 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 8 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 8 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 8 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |