MD SB54 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-17 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-17 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain provisions of law regarding the prohibition on certain departments of State government from denying an occupational license or certificate to an applicant solely on the basis of the criminal history of the applicant by prohibiting a department from requiring disclosure of certain actions on an application and establishing a predetermination review process; authorizing a department to charge a criminal history review fee of no more than $100 or to waive the fee under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Prohibited Disclosures and Predetermination Review Process
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB175 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-18 - Referred Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Arrests
Business Occupations and Professions
Certifications
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedures
Disclosure
District Courts
Education
Environment, Department of the
Expungement
Fees
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Poverty
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Safety
Time
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Arrests
Business Occupations and Professions
Certifications
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedures
Disclosure
District Courts
Education
Environment, Department of the
Expungement
Fees
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Poverty
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Safety
Time
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 1 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |