MD SB560 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain institutions of higher education to provide certain information to students who are applying to be a resident of certain types of student housing; and requiring an occupancy agreement between a student and the Maryland Economic Development Corporation to include certain information.
Title
Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {693328/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB385 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Subjects
Contracts
Disclosure
Economic Development
Emergencies
Health
Higher Education
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Notices
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Residency
Safety
Signatures
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Time
Disclosure
Economic Development
Emergencies
Health
Higher Education
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Notices
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Residency
Safety
Signatures
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |