MD SB561 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a manufacturer's limited beer, wine, and liquor permit in Frederick County that authorizes the holder to allow a licensed caterer or other contracted party to provide sealed beer, wine, and liquor products not manufactured by the holder during private events for on-premises consumption, subject to certain restrictions; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue a permit to holders of certain manufacturer's licenses; and requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Limited Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1005 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {303623/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {943227/1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB587 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1004
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Breweries
Distilleries
Ethics
Fees
Frederick County
Independent Contractors
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Special Events
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Breweries
Distilleries
Ethics
Fees
Frederick County
Independent Contractors
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Special Events
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 402.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |