MD SB568 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain date to January 1, 2020, by which the State is required to discontinue a certain prescription drug benefit for certain retirees; authorizing certain retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan with a certain dependent to elect to have the dependent covered under a certain State prescription drug benefit plan; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to provide a certain notice to certain retirees of certain changes not later July 1, 2019; etc.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Drugs
Health Insurance
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Retirement Systems
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Support of Dependents
Time
Drugs
Health Insurance
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Retirement Systems
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Support of Dependents
Time