MD SB576 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement that a petition for guardianship of a disabled person include signed and verified certificates of competency by providing that the certificates may be signed and verified by a nurse practitioner and certain other health care practitioners; altering the requirements for the certification of a patient's incapacity to make an informed decision regarding treatment or of a patient's terminal or end-stage condition to allow the second individual making the certification to be a nurse practitioner; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {494733/1 Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB691 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Advance Medical Directives
Certifications
Death
Disabilities
Diseases
Estates and Trusts
Evidence
Examinations
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Petitions
Physicians
Public Health
Signatures
Vulnerable Adults
Certifications
Death
Disabilities
Diseases
Estates and Trusts
Evidence
Examinations
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Petitions
Physicians
Public Health
Signatures
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |