MD SB578 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2025 and each fiscal year thereafter, to include at least $500,000 in the annual budget for the Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program.
Title
Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 782 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {993821/1 Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1472 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Subjects
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Fire Protection
Governor
Health
Medical Conditions
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Fire Protection
Governor
Health
Medical Conditions
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 4001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |