MD SB580 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Allegany County Board of License Commissioners to grant a specified 1-day special license for an entertainment event; limiting the duration of the license; authorizing the Allegany County Board of County Commissioners to determine the amount of a specified fee based on a recommendation; requiring license holders to exercise the privileges of the license on county-owned property; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - 1-Day Special License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-17 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
County Commissioners
Fees
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
County Commissioners
Fees
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations