MD SB580 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer from considering a claim for a weather-related event for the purpose of canceling or refusing to renew coverage for homeowner's insurance if the claim is for an amount of loss that is less than the insured's deductible under the policy or is resolved with no payout to the homeowner by the insurer.
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2021-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB641 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-02 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Claims
Consumer Protection
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Property Damage
Real Property
Residential Property
Weather
Consumer Protection
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Property Damage
Real Property
Residential Property
Weather