MD SB586 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding provisions of law designating the Motor Vehicle Administration as an agent with respect to service of process in an action related to a motor vehicle accident or collision to include resident drivers under specified circumstances; requiring the Administration to serve as an agent for service of process under specified circumstances, take specified actions, and report annually to the General Assembly; requiring a motor vehicle insurer to act as the agent for a resident driver under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Motor Vehicle Administration and Insurer as Agent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-09 | Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-09 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (34-12) | |
2011-03-28 | Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Accidents
Agents and Brokers
Civil Actions
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Process Serving
Records
Reports
Subpoenas
Summonses
Agents and Brokers
Civil Actions
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Process Serving
Records
Reports
Subpoenas
Summonses