MD SB605 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified provision of law to require the Athletic Trainer Advisory Committee to recommend to the State Board of Physicians approval, modification, or disapproval of individual evaluation and treatment protocols; authorizing, under specified circumstances, an athletic trainer to assume duties under an evaluation and treatment protocol after receiving a specified recommendation from the Committee; etc.
Title
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {854236/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ambulances
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Education
Fire Protection
Good Samaritan
Health
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Liability
Notices
Physicians
Rescue Squads
Sports and Recreation
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Education
Fire Protection
Good Samaritan
Health
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Liability
Notices
Physicians
Rescue Squads
Sports and Recreation