MD SB607 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, with specified exceptions, a person to register annually with the Department of Agriculture before transporting waste kitchen grease; requiring a specified person to submit a specified application to the Department in the form required by the Department; requiring the application to include specified information and fees; requiring the Department to register specified applicants and issue each registrant specified items; requiring each registrant to carry a certificate when transporting waste kitchen grease; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Waste Kitchen Grease
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-38) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (42-3) | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Alternative Energy Sources
Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Food
Forms
Fuel
Labeling
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Registration
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
State's Attorneys
Transportation
Alternative Energy Sources
Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Food
Forms
Fuel
Labeling
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Registration
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
State's Attorneys
Transportation