MD SB607 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that motor scooter and electric low speed scooter sharing companies include on each motor scooter or electric low speed scooter made available to the public an embossed tactile display with contact information through which an individual who is blind or visually impaired may contact the company; requiring that motor scooter and electric low speed sharing companies provide individuals with disabilities nonvisual access to their websites and mobile applications in a way that is consistent with federal standards; etc.
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 253 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {967475/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB557 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Subjects
Blind Persons
Commerce and Business
Communications
Disabilities
Electronic Communication
Equipment
internet
Leases and Rent
Mobile Devices
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Notices
Public Information
Ridesharing
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Vulnerable Adults
Commerce and Business
Communications
Disabilities
Electronic Communication
Equipment
internet
Leases and Rent
Mobile Devices
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Notices
Public Information
Ridesharing
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 11 | 134.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |