MD SB611 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing training requirements for members of the State Board of Dental Examiners; and establishing and codifying Board disciplinary processes related to the issuance of final decisions and summary suspensions of licenses.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {353929/1 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {603524/1 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB969 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Health
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Safety
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Health
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Safety
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 318.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |