MD SB621 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB285
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the local governing body of a county, including Baltimore City, to authorize its police accountability board to exercise investigatory and subpoena powers; and authorizing a police accountability board to conduct an investigation of police misconduct concurrently with a law enforcement agency investigating the complaint.
Title
County Police Accountability Boards - Investigation of Complaints of Police Misconduct
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB533 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
SB285 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
SB285 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
complaints
Counties
Investigations and Inquiries
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Subpoenas
complaints
Counties
Investigations and Inquiries
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Subpoenas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0621?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0621f.pdf |