MD SB645 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City from selling property to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service under specified circumstances.
Title
Baltimore City - Sale of Property to Enforce Lien for Water and Sewer Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |