MD SB657 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Pilot Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims to prevent HIV infection for victims of an alleged rape or sexual offense or victims of alleged child sexual abuse; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the program; requiring that a victim of an alleged rape or sexual offense or a victim of alleged child sexual abuse be provided with a full course of treatment and follow-up care for postexposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV infection; etc.
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2019-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {598977/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
Subjects
AIDS
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Diseases
Health
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Liability
Notices
Privacy
Public Health
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Victims
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Diseases
Health
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Liability
Notices
Privacy
Public Health
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Victims