MD SB662 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified pharmacies to require an adult to sign for the delivery of specified controlled dangerous substances to a residence; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy to waive specified requirements for specified pharmacies under specified circumstances; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Pharmacies - Delivery of Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-10 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Special Order later today (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Forms
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Records
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Forms
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Records
Rules and Regulations
Signatures