MD SB677 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with the Maryland Higher Education Commission and specified representatives from specified institutions of higher education, to develop a master plan that focuses on specified issues relating to qualified providers of early childhood education services; requiring the Department and the Commission to submit a specified plan and specified recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Title
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-6) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634736/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Child Care
Children
Education
Education, State Department of
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Children
Education
Education, State Department of
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment